Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 11/26/2020 2:03:22 AM
Wednesday, October 7, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 9/2/2020 2:12 PM
10:00 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
The meeting will be conducted via webinar. To view click here
General Meeting

Financial Education and Capability Commission
Created: 9/24/2020 1:44 PM
10:00 AM to 11:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
Please RSVP to receive the zoom link by emailing Sue Rogan at sue@cashmd.org
The Commission will discuss topics related to reentry into the workforce for people who were recently incarcerated.

Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Created: 9/28/2020 10:48 AM
1:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
Briefings on temporary housing, foster youth, and updates from advocate groups.
(Added - 10/6/2020 5:26 PM)
Briefings on transitional housing, foster youth, and updates from advocate groups.
(Removed - 10/6/2020 5:26 PM)

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Created: 6/18/2020 11:35 AM
9:00 AM - One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
To join the meeting click here
Meeting of Full Authority+Hearings
Meeting ID: 959 9460 1231
(Added - 9/30/2020 5:17 PM)
Passcode: 466266
(Added - 9/30/2020 5:17 PM)
Phone-in #: 301-715-8592
(Added - 9/30/2020 5:17 PM)