Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 11/26/2020 2:22:41 AM
Wednesday, October 7, 2020
Wednesday, October 7, 2020
Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Change made: October 7, 2020 11:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On - Other
December 8, 2020 5:00 PM
On-Line Meeting
To accomodate all who wish to participate in the meeting, the Commission requests that each speaker limit his or her comments to five minutes. The Commission Chair will enforce this limit.
All who are interested in speaking are asked to register via the registration link above or go to http://msccsp.org/About/Meetings.aspx
All registered participants are asked to submit written testimony at least three days prior to the hearing. Please email written testimony to David Soule, Executive Director of the Commission, at dsoule@umd.edu
Members of the public are invited to address the Commission with their concerns about sentencing policy issues in Maryland.
Instructions for participation in the videoconference will be provided upon registration approval.

Change made: October 7, 2020 12:03 PM - HEARING ADDED
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On - Other
December 8, 2020 6:30 PM
On-Line Meeting
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Joint Committee on Federal Relations
Change made: October 7, 2020 8:34 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Joint Committee on Federal Relations - Briefing
October 14, 2020 9:30 AM
On-Line Meeting
Briefing regarding the Interstate Compact for Children (as a replacement for the existing Interstate Compact on the Placement of Children).
REMOVED: 8:34 AM
(Presenting agencies/organizations to posted soon.)
REMOVED: 8:34 AM
Briefing by the American Public Human Services Association and the Maryland Department of Human Services regarding the Interstate Compact for the Placement of Children (as a replacement for the existing Interstate Compact on the Placement of Children).
ADDED: 8:34 AM

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Change made: October 7, 2020 4:18 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
October 8, 2020 9:00 AM to October 8, 2020 11:30 AM
(Previous Date/Time: October 8, 2020 9:00 AM to 11:00 AM)
Zoom Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).