Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Senator Shirley Nathan-Pulliam

District
44
County
Baltimore City and Baltimore
Annapolis Info
2 West Miller Senate Office Building
11 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3612 | 410-841-3612
Toll-free in MD 1-800-492-7122 ext. 3612
Interim Info
2 West Miller Senate Office Building
11 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3612 | 410-841-3612
Contact
Email
Party
Democrat
Tenure
First elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 1994. Member of the House January 11, 1995 to January 14, 2015, representing District 10, Baltimore County (Baltimore City, 1995-2003). First elected to the Maryland Senate in 2014. Member of the Senate since January 14, 2015, representing District 44, Baltimore City and Baltimore County. Resigned effective December 1, 2019.
Current Assignments
2019 Vice Chair, Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee (Member 2015)
2016 Co-Chair, Health Subcommittee of the Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee (Member, 2015)
2019 Alcohol Subcommittee of the Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
2016 Joint Committee on the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Areas
2015 Joint Committee on Children, Youth and Families
1995- Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
1995- Women Legislators of Maryland (Legislative Committee, 2001 -)
Past Senate Service
Workgroup on Death with Dignity, 2015.
Past House Service
Deputy Majority Whip, 2013-2014, 2003-2010; Health and Government Operations Committee, 2003-2014; Chair, Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2004-2014; Insurance Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2005-2014; Public Health Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2003-2005; Health Facilities, Equipment and Products Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2003-2004; Long Term Care Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2003-2004; Environmental Matters Committee, 1995-2003; Health Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee, 1999-2003; Health and Public Utilities Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee, 1995-1999; Joint Committee on Health Care Delivery and Financing, 1995-2014; Joint Legislative Task Force on Organ and Tissue Donations, 1997-1998; Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families, 2003-2010; Rural Health-Care Workgroup, 2011-2014.
Public Service
Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City, 2018-; Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity - Mogan State University, 2018-; Task Force to Study Point-of-Care Testing for Lead Poisoning, 2013-2014; Task Force on the Discipline of Health Care Professionals and Improved Patient Care, 2008-2009; Workgroup on Cultural Competency and Workforce Development for Mental Health Professionals, 2007-2008; Mental Health Oversight Committee, 2007-2015; Statewide Steering Committee on Services for Adults with Sickle Cell Disease, 2007-; Adult Sickle-Cell Disease Care Working Group, 2006; Task Force on the Needs of Persons with Co-Occurring Mental Health and Substance Use Disorders, 2005-2006; Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, 2005-2014; Vice Chair, Committee on Health, National Black Caucus of State Legislators, 2003-2005; Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes, 2000-2005; Asbestos Oversight Committee, 1995-2005; Secretary, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, 2002-2004; Maryland Advisory Council for New Americans, 1998-2004; Secretary, Baltimore County Delegation, 2003-2014; Task Force to Study Health Care Needs of Inmates in Transition from Correctional Institutions, 2000-2002; Redistricting Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, 2000-2002; Vice Chair, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, 2000-2002; Chair, Legislative Review Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, 2001-; Co-Chair, Effectiveness Committee of Task Force to Study Increasing the Availability of Substance Abuse Programs, 1998-2001; Chair, Health Care Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, 2000; State Advisory Council on Nutrition, 1998-2000; Executive Board, Women Legislators of Maryland, 1998-2000; Task Force on Quality of Care in Nursing Facilities, 1999; Task Force on Maryland's Dairy Industry, 1995-1997; Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee, 1996-; Delegate, Democratic Party National Convention, 1996; Social Services Commission, Baltimore City, 1990-1994; Human Services and Welfare Committee, National Conference of State Legislatures; Former Member, Liaison Work Group, Baltimore City Delegation.
Memberships
Maryland Bicycle and Pedestrian Caucus, 2003-; Board of Directors, Planned Parenthood of Maryland, 1996-1999; Maryland Green Caucus, 1996-; Honor Society of Nursing, 1996-; Women Legislators of Maryland (President, 2006-2007; President-Elect 2005-2006; 2nd Vice President, 2003-2004, Executive Board, 1998-2000), 1995-; Democratic State Central Committee, 1990-1994; Legislative and Executive Committee, Maryland Democratic Party, 1990-1994; Jamaican Association of Maryland; Black Mental Health Alliance; American Nurses Association; National Black Nurses Association; National Association of Health Service Executives; National Political Congress of Black Women; Baltimore City Community College Nursing Alumni Association; Maryland Black Congress on Health Law and Economics; Maryland Nurses Association.
Awards
John Heinz III Award, National Adult Day Services Association, 2018; Legislator of the Year, Maryland Association of Resources for Families and Youth, 2012; Hepatitis Hero of Maryland, Maryland Hepatitis Coalition, 2011; Judith Bennett-Sattler Award, Jamaican Women of Washington, Inc., 2007; Maryland's Top 100 Women, Daily Record, Circle of Excellence, 2007, 2005, 2002; Value Hours Award, Fullwood Foundation, Inc., 2004; Legislative Award, Metropolitan Baltimore Branch, Mental Health Association of Maryland, 2003; Positive People Award, Baltimore Times, 2003; Distinguished Service Award, Barbados National Association of Baltimore, 2002; Legislator of the Year, American Heart Association, 2001; Certificate of Appreciation, the Consul General of Jamaica, 2001; Certificate of Merit, New York State Senate, 2001; Legislative Award, Mid-Atlantic Community Health Center, 1999; Legislator of the Year, Maryland Nursing Association, 1997; Community Service Award, Sigma Theta Tau International (National Association of Health Service Executives), 1997; Women Power, Inc. Inductee, Alumni Hall of Distinction, Baltimore City Community College.
Biographical Information
Born, Trelawny, Jamaica, West Indies, May 20, 1939; Attended Mico School, Kingston, Jamaica, 1957; Bootham Park and Naburn Hospital School of Nursing, Yorkshire, England, 1960; Baltimore City Hospital School of Practical Nursing, L.P.N., 1962; Baltimore Community College, A.A., Nursing, 1975; University of Maryland at Baltimore, B.S., Nursing, 1980; The Johns Hopkins University, M.A.S., Administrative Science, 1987; Faculty Associate, The Johns Hopkins University School of Nursing, 1997-2000; Registered Nurse; Business Owner; Three children; five grandchildren.
Last Updated: 12/2/2019 10:29 AM