Status of LegislationTotal number of Bills: 13
Status as of February 10, 2003: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of February 19, 2003: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of February 18, 2003: Bill is in the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Status as of May 22, 2003: Became Law - Chapter 445
Status as of March 22, 2003: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Health and Government Operations
Status as of March 14, 2003: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Health and Government Operations
Status as of February 12, 2003: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary
Status as of February 12, 2003: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of May 22, 2003: Became Law - Chapter 455
Status as of May 13, 2003: Became Law - Chapter 227
Status as of March 21, 2003: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 27, 2003: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of May 22, 2003: Vetoed by the Governor - Cross-filed bill was signed