Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 992

File Code: Criminal Law - Procedure Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 624
Sponsored By:
Delegates Anderson, Carter, Conaway, Lee, Love, and Rosenberg
Entitled:
Criminal Procedure - Drug-Related Offenses - Parole Eligibility for Second Offenders

Synopsis:

Altering a specified provision concerning eligibility for parole by providing that a person convicted of a specified drug-related offense is not eligible for parole during a specified mandatory minimum sentence if the person has been convicted of a violation of a specified crime of violence arising out of the incident that resulted in the imposition of the mandatory minimum sentence.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
2/9
First Reading Judiciary
2/13
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/17
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Special Order 3/21 (Delegate Aumann) Adopted
3/18
Special Order 3/22 (Delegate Aumann) Adopted
3/19
Floor Amendment (Delegate Aumann) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/20
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Benson) Adopted
Third Reading Failed (68-69)
3/22
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Delegate Anderson) Adopted (78-59)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted
Third Reading Passed (71-66)
4/4
Returned Passed
Senate Action
3/24
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
3/29
Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2
Favorable Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Hooper) Rejected (22-24)
Second Reading Passed
4/3
Third Reading Passed (29-18)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/16
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Curt Anderson, District 43
Delegate Jill P. Carter, District 41
Delegate Frank M. Conaway, Jr., District 40
Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Mary Ann E. Love, District 32
Delegate Samuel I. Rosenberg, District 41

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Substance Abuse
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties; Sentences; etc.
Guns
Hearings
Parole and Probation
Penalties
Prisoners -see also- Ex-Offenders
Review Boards
Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Substance Abuse
Weapons -see also- Guns

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Criminal Law
( 5-602 , 5-603 , 5-604 , 5-605 , 5-606 , 5-608 , 5-609 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 543124/02     Offered on: March 22, 2007   at: 12:06 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 652914/01     Offered on: March 20, 2007   at: 10:35 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 903027/01     Offered on: April 6, 2007   at: 4:29 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 20, 2007: Third Reading Failed (68-69)
March 22, 2007: Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Anderson) Adopted (78-59)
March 22, 2007: Third Reading Passed (71-66)
Senate
April 2, 2007: Floor Amendment (Hooper) {903027/1 Rejected (22-24)
April 3, 2007: Third Reading Passed (29-18)