Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1049

File Code: Public Health Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 774
Sponsored By:
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Aumann, Barnes, Beidle, Branch, Braveboy, DeBoy, Frush, Gaines, Haynes, Howard, Hucker, Impallaria, Ivey, N. King, Love, Manno, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Proctor, Ramirez, Ross, Shewell, Sossi, Stein, Taylor, Lee, Hammen, Beitzel, Benson, Bromwell, Donoghue, Elliott, Hubbard, Kach, Kullen, McDonough, Oaks, Pendergrass, Riley, Tarrant, V. Turner, and Weldon
Entitled:
Cervical Cancer Committee - HPV Vaccine Subcommittee

Synopsis:

Establishing the human papillomavirus (HPV) vaccine subcommittee in the Cervical Cancer Committee of the Maryland Comprehensive Cancer Control Plan; providing for the membership and duties of the HPV vaccine subcommittee; requiring the HPV vaccine subcommittee to submit an annual report to the Cervical Cancer Committee by September 1; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
2/9
First Reading Health and Government Operations
3/7
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/20
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/21
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
4/5
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/23
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/24
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 191

Sponsored by:

Delegate Joseline Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Susan L. M. Aumann, District 42
Delegate Ben Barnes, District 21
Delegate Pamela Beidle, District 32
Delegate Wendell R. Beitzel, District 1A
Delegate Joanne C. Benson, District 24
Delegate Talmadge Branch, District 45
Delegate Aisha N. Braveboy, District 25
Delegate Eric M. Bromwell, District 8
Delegate Steven J. DeBoy, Sr., District 12A
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Donald B. Elliott, District 4B
Delegate Barbara Frush, District 21
Delegate Tawanna P. Gaines, District 22
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46
Delegate Keith E. Haynes, District 44
Delegate Carolyn J. B. Howard, District 24
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Rick Impallaria, District 7
Delegate Jolene Ivey, District 47
Delegate Wade Kach, District 5
Delegate Nancy J. King, District 39
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Mary Ann E. Love, District 32
Delegate Roger Manno, District 19
Delegate Pat McDonough, District 7
Delegate Heather Mizeur, District 20
Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate James E. Proctor, Jr., District 27A
Delegate Victor R. Ramirez, District 47
Delegate B. Daniel Riley, District 34A
Delegate Justin D. Ross, District 22
Delegate Tanya Shewell, District 5A
Delegate Richard A. Sossi, District 36
Delegate Dana Stein, District 11
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40
Delegate Herman L. Taylor, Jr., District 14
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26
Delegate Richard B. Weldon, Jr., District 3B

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Health -see also- Mental Health
Immunization
Reports
Sunset
Women

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 846188/01     Offered on: March 23, 2007   at: 10:59 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 854835/01     Offered on: April 6, 2007   at: 12:36 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 21, 2007: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
April 5, 2007: Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Senate
April 3, 2007: Third Reading Passed (45-2)