Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


2012 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1122

File Code: Juvenile Law Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 761
Sponsored By:
Delegates Valderrama, Anderson, Lee, F. Turner, and Valentino-Smith
Entitled:
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities - Report

Synopsis:

Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to make a report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2012, regarding the manner in which the Department will work toward ensuring that youth charged as adults can be detained in juvenile detention facilities; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used. For explanation of terms click here.
House Action
2/10
First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23

Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/20
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order until 3/24 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
3/21
Favorable with Amendments {572219/1
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Substitute Committee Amendment {772312/1 Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
4/4
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (125-9)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/22
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30
Favorable with Amendments {598776/1
Committee Amendment Adopted
Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Muse) Adopted
4/1
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/2
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/2
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 416

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kriselda Valderrama, District 26
Delegate Curt Anderson, District 43
Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Frank S. Turner, District 13
Delegate Geraldine Valentino-Smith, District 23A

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Circuit Courts
Correctional Institutions -see also- Patuxent Institution
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
District Courts
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners -see also- Ex-Offenders
Reports
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 572219/01     Offered on: March 24, 2012   at: 2:43 p.m.     Status: Withdrawn
Number: 772312/01     Offered on: March 24, 2012   at: 2:44 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 598776/01     Offered on: April 5, 2012   at: 11:38 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Judiciary
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 22, 2012: Third Reading Passed (135-1)
April 4, 2012: Third Reading Passed (125-9)
Senate
April 2, 2012: Third Reading Passed (46-0)