Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Schedule - Weekly Addenda

Addenda To Weekly Schedule Published May 17, 2018


May 18 May 22

Issued: May 18, 2018

MARYLAND MEDICAID ADVISORY COMMITTEE - Addendum Number: 18-2

   THURSDAY    MAY 24, 2018

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room L-3
                                     To          Lobby Level Conference Room
                                  3:00 P.M.      Department Of Health
                                                 201 W. Preston Street
                                                 Baltimore, MD

    Subject:  To Be Announced

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Carrol Barnes, Maryland Department Of
      Health
              Telephone: 410-767-5213

NATALIE M LAPRA MD MED CANN COMM FULL COMM - Addendum Number: 18-1

   THURSDAY    MAY 24, 2018

                                  2:00 P.M.      Harford County
                                     To          Council Chambers
                                  4:00 P.M.      212 S. Bond Street
                                                 Bel Air, MD

   NOTE   Location Change

    Subject:  Votes On Dispensary Licenses, An Independent Testing Laboratory
              Registration, And Changes To Regulations.  Some Standing
              Committees Will Be Reporting.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Mary-Jo Mather, Maryland Medical Cannabis
      Commission
              Telephone: 410-487-8052

NATALIE M. LAPRADE MD MEDICAL CANNABIS COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 18-2

   THURSDAY    MAY 24, 2018

                                  12:30 P.M.     Harford County
                                      To         Council Chambers
                                   2:00 P.M.     212 S. Bond Street
                                                 Bel Air, MD

   NOTE   Location Change

    Subject:  Potential Revisions To The Commission's Regulations

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Mary-Jo Mather, Maryland Medical Cannabis
      Commission
              Telephone: 410-487-8052

Issued: May 22, 2018

LEGISLATIVE ETHICS, JOINT COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 18-2

   WEDNESDAY   MAY 23, 2018

                                  9:30 A.M.      Room UL1
                                                 Judicial College
                                                 Education And Conference Center
                                                 2011D Commerce Park Drive
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Time And Location Change

    Subject:  Review Of Disclosures And Disclaimers

              Work Session

              A Portion Of The Meeting May Be Closed To Comply With A Statutory
              Requirement That Prevents Public Disclosure Of Matters That May Be
              Discussed.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Deadra W. Daly, Dept. Of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5200 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5200 (Washington, D.C. Area)



May 22, 2018 2:45 P.M.