Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Schedule - Weekly Addenda

Addenda To Weekly Schedule Published July 26, 2018


July 30 August 1

Issued: July 30, 2018

FINANCIAL EDUCATION AND CAPABILITY COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 18-2

   TUESDAY     JULY 31, 2018

                                  10:00 A.M.     Harry Hughes
                                      To         Conference Room
                                  12:00 P.M.     Maryland Department Of
                                                 Transportation Headquarters
                                                 7201 Corporate Center Drive
                                                 Hanover, MD

    Subject:  Impact On Financial Capability Of Automobile Ownership, Lending,
              And Repair Costs

              Review Results From The 2018 Financial Education & Capability
              Survey

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Holly Mirbella, MD CASH Campaign
              Telephone: 443-302-9574

Issued: August 1, 2018

IEE WORK GROUP 2: HIGH QUALITY TEACHERS AND LEADERS - Addendum Number: 18-1

   WEDNESDAY   AUGUST 8, 2018

                                  9:30 A.M.      Room 120
                                     To          Appropriation Committee Room
                                  2:00 P.M.      House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Work Session

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Rachel Hise, Dept. Of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510 (Washington, D.C. Area)



August 1, 2018 3:41 P.M.