Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Schedule - Weekly Addenda

Addenda To Weekly Schedule Published September 6, 2018


September 10

Issued: September 10, 2018

IEE WORK GROUP 2: HIGH QUALITY TEACHERS AND LEADERS - Addendum Number: 18-2

   FRIDAY      SEPTEMBER 14, 2018

                                  1:00 P.M.      Conference Call
                                     To
                                  2:30 P.M.

    Subject:  Work Session

              To Join The Audio Conference Call:
              (1) Call The Dial-In Number (605-472-5746)
              (2) When Prompted, Enter The Access Code (608885), Followed By
                  Pound Or Hash (#)

   MONDAY      SEPTEMBER 17, 2018

                                  3:00 P.M.      Conference Call
                                     To
                                  5:00 P.M.

    Subject:  Work Session, If Necessary

              To Join The Audio Conference Call:
              (1) Call The Dial-In Number (605-472-5746)
              (2) When Prompted, Enter The Access Code (608885), Followed By
                  Pound Or Hash (#)

              To Verify Status Of September 17 Meeting, Check The Commission's
              Webpage

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Rachel Hise, Dept. Of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510
                         301-970-5510 (Washington, D.C. Area)



September 12, 2018 8:01 A.M.