Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Schedule - Weekly Addenda

Addenda To Weekly Schedule Published October 18, 2018


October 19 October 22 October 23

Issued: October 19, 2018

FINANCIAL EDUCATION AND CAPABILITY COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 18-2

   MONDAY      OCTOBER 22, 2018

                                  10:00 A.M.     Harry Hughes
                                      To         Conference Room
                                  12:00 P.M.     Maryland Department Of
                                                 Transportation Headquarters
                                                 7201 Corporate Center Drive
                                                 Hanover, MD

    Subject:  The Commission Will Learn About Current Trends In Financial
              Capability For Maryland's Reentry Population, And Will Finalize
              Its 2018 Recommendations.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Holly Mirbella, CASH Campaign Of Maryland
              Telephone: 443-302-9574

Issued: October 22, 2018

NEXT GENERATION 9-1-1 ACROSS MD, COMMISSION TO ADV - Addendum Number: 18-1

   TUESDAY     OCTOBER 23, 2018

                                  10:00 A.M.     Joint Hearing Room
                                      To         Dept. Of Legislative Services
                                   4:00 P.M.     90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  State Commission Meeting

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Claire Souhan, Office Of Senator Cheryl
      Kagan
              Telephone: 410-841-3134
                         301-858-3134 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: October 23, 2018

PRINCE GEORGES CO SCHOOL CONST MASTER PLAN WKGP - Addendum Number: 18-1

   WEDNESDAY   OCTOBER 24, 2018

                                   2:00 P.M.     Room 122
                                                 Sasscer Admin Building
                                                 14201 School Lane
                                                 Upper Marlboro, MD

    Subject:  October Workgroup Meeting

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT: Michelle Lambert
              Telephone: 410-946-5350
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)



October 24, 2018 8:53 A.M.