Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 23-17
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Decreasing the lowest maximum speed limit that Montgomery County may establish for a highway outside an urban district under specified circumstances from 25 miles an hour to 20 miles an hour.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {850714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-39)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 23-17
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {850714/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 23-17
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (101-39) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM