Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Chang, Ebersole, Jalisi, Kramer, Krebs, Lam, Mautz, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a transfer of real property from a sole proprietorship to a limited liability company from recordation and transfer taxes if the sole member of the limited liability company is identical to the converting sole proprietor and specified other conditions are met; providing that the transfer of a controlling interest in a limited liability company that is the product of an untaxed conversion from a sole proprietorship is subject to the recordation and transfer tax under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0111
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0044 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {805060/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {805060/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Text - Chapter - Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
(   12-108, 12-117, 13-103, 13-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page