Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Certificated School Personnel - Training Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo and Pena-Melnyk
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to require, beginning on or before July 1, 2018, all certificated school personnel who have direct contact with students on a regular basis to complete training, by December 1 of each year, in specified knowledge and skills required to understand and respond to youth suicide risk and identify specified resources to help students in crisis; prohibiting a person from bringing a specified action against a county board except under specified circumstances;
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0921 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {865264/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504230/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Training Requirement
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {865264/1 Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Training Requirement
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {504230/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Primary and Secondary Education - Certificated School Personnel - Training Requirement
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text - Chapter - Primary and Secondary Education - Certificated School Personnel - Training Requirement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-122, 6-704.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM