Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital Projects
Sponsored by
Delegates Griffith, Bohanan, Guzzone, Jones, Mizeur, Proctor, Tarrant, Zucker, Hammen, Cullison, A. Kelly, Murphy, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that artwork funded by the Maryland Public Art Initiative Program is the property of the Maryland Commission on Public Art; providing that the Commission is responsible for the inventory, maintenance, and preservation of specified artwork; requiring the State to include public art in all construction projects and major renovation projects under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0702
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {726188/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-6)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {726188/1 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (129-6) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Finance 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 60
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM