Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Left Lane - Use for Passing
Sponsored by
Delegates Folden, Parrott, C. Howard, S. Howard, McKay, McMillan, W. Miller, Oaks, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, on a roadway that has three or more lanes for traffic moving in the same direction with a posted maximum speed limit of 55 miles per hour or more, the far left lane may be used only for the overtaking and passing of another vehicle in a specified manner and under specified circumstances; and establishing that the penalty for a violation of the Act for a first offense is $75, for a second offense is $150, and for a third or subsequent offense is $250.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Left Lane - Use for Passing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {840415/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate J. Lewis) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {133024/1 (Delegate J. Lewis) Rejected
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {273721/1 (Delegate Kramer) Rejected (42-91)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {953628/1 (Delegate Kramer) Rejected (51-83)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Left Lane - Use for Passing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (73-66)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Left Lane - Use for Passing
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {840415/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate J. Lewis) Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {133024/1 (Delegate J. Lewis) Rejected 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {273721/1 (Delegate Kramer) Rejected (42-91) 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {953628/1 (Delegate Kramer) Rejected (51-83) 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Left Lane - Use for Passing
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (73-66) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM