Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring insurance producers and public adjusters to complete the continuing education required under certain provisions of law not later than 15 days before the expiration of the license; requiring that certain regulations require providers of continuing education to submit evidence of course completion to the Commissioner within 10 days after completing a course of continuing education; requiring the Commissioner to report on the effectiveness of certain course offerings to certain legislative committees by December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, January 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2018 10/15/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Senate 1/03/2019 1/03/2019 Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {247271/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 27
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Referred Economic Matters 29
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {683197/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-116, 10-408 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM