Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Benson, Conway, Currie, Dyson, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Rosapepe, Brochin, Forehand, Hershey, Jacobs, Stone, and Zirkin
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Rescinding Maryland's ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0002
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
6
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {508575/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 6
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments {508575/1 Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 32
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM