Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Economic Development And Business Climate Commission, MD

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250 (SB0841)
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251 (SB0844)
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252 (SB0842)
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0840)
Title
Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Refundability
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254 (SB0845)
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 (SB0843/CH0582)
Title
Tax Credits - Evaluations and Sunset Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB1253)
Title
Income Tax - Rates, Personal Exemptions, and Earned Income Tax Credit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB1250)
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842 (HB1252)
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 /CH0582 (HB1255)
Title
Tax Credits - Evaluations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 (HB1251)
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0845 (HB1254)
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847
Title
Estate Tax - Exclusion Amount
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1250 (SB0841) Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - Exemption By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1251 (SB0844) Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1252 (SB0842) Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1253 (SB0840) Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Refundability By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1254 (SB0845) Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 (SB0843/CH0582) Tax Credits - Evaluations and Sunset Provisions By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0840 (HB1253) Income Tax - Rates, Personal Exemptions, and Earned Income Tax Credit By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0841 (HB1250) Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - Exemption By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0842 (HB1252) Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0843 /CH0582 (HB1255) Tax Credits - Evaluations By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0844 (HB1251) Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0845 (HB1254) Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 Estate Tax - Exclusion Amount By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM