Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Howard County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223 /CH0138
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 (SB0640)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - PHILLIPS School Commercial Kitchen Ho. Co. 1-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0641)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – Ellicott City Public Arts Project Ho. Co. 2–18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339 (SB0535)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Lisbon Volunteer Fire Department Ho. Co. 5-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 /CH0811
Title
Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0341 (SB0642)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Gateway Innovation Center Ho. Co. 3-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0342
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C BWL License Ho. Co. 21-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 (SB0537)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Ellicott City Baltimore and Ohio Railroad Station Museum Ho. Co. 22-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 (SB0536)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Barnard Fort House Ho. Co. 23-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809 /CH0829
Title
Howard County - Sheriff's Salary Ho. Co. 8-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 /CH0139
Title
Howard County – Class 7 Micro–Brewery License and Multiple Class B and Class BLX Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 06–18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0837
Title
Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 /CH0140
Title
Howard County Student Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Teachers Ho. Co. 14–18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186 /CH0141
Title
Howard County - Property Tax Credit - Natural Disaster Ho. Co. 09-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Howard County Board of Education - Superintendent of Schools - Term Length Ho. Co. 11-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1325 /CH0142
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C License and Class C and Class D Per Diem Entertainment Venue Licenses Ho. Co. 20-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0223 /CH0138 Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0337 (SB0640) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - PHILLIPS School Commercial Kitchen Ho. Co. 1-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB0338 (SB0641) Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – Ellicott City Public Arts Project Ho. Co. 2–18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB0339 (SB0535) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Lisbon Volunteer Fire Department Ho. Co. 5-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB0340 /CH0811 Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 811
Ways and Means
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0341 (SB0642) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Gateway Innovation Center Ho. Co. 3-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB0342 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C BWL License Ho. Co. 21-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0343 (SB0537) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Ellicott City Baltimore and Ohio Railroad Station Museum Ho. Co. 22-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB0397 (SB0536) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Barnard Fort House Ho. Co. 23-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB0809 /CH0829 Howard County - Sheriff's Salary Ho. Co. 8-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 /CH0139 Howard County – Class 7 Micro–Brewery License and Multiple Class B and Class BLX Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 06–18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1115 /CH0837 Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1180 /CH0140 Howard County Student Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Teachers Ho. Co. 14–18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 /CH0141 Howard County - Property Tax Credit - Natural Disaster Ho. Co. 09-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Ways and Means
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Howard County Board of Education - Superintendent of Schools - Term Length Ho. Co. 11-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1325 /CH0142 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C License and Class C and Class D Per Diem Entertainment Venue Licenses Ho. Co. 20-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM