Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


2009 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 294

File Code: Natural Resources - Generally Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 273
Sponsored By:
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Ali, Barve, Beidle, Benson, Cane, Carr, V. Clagett, Feldman, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Healey, Hecht, Howard, Hucker, Lafferty, Lee, Mizeur, Montgomery, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Manno, Glenn, and Stein
Entitled:
Smart, Green, and Growing - Local Government Planning - Planning Visions

Synopsis:

Revising the State Economic Growth, Resource Protection, and Planning Policy visions; requiring local jurisdictions to submit a specified report every 2 years on or before July 1 to the Department of Planning; requiring the Department to publish a specified report every 2 years on or before January 1; authorizing specified local jurisdictions to establish a program for the transfer of development rights within a priority funding area for specified purposes; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/29
First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/18
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/20
Third Reading Passed (111-21)
4/3
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (129-8)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/23
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/4
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/7
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 177

Sponsored by:

Speaker, The
Administration
Delegate Saqib Ali, District 39
Delegate Kumar P. Barve, District 17
Delegate Pamela Beidle, District 32
Delegate Joanne C. Benson, District 24
Delegate Rudolph C. Cane, District 37A
Delegate Alfred C. Carr, Jr., District 18
Delegate Virginia P. Clagett, District 30
Delegate Brian J. Feldman, District 15
Delegate Barbara Frush, District 21
Delegate Tawanna P. Gaines, District 22
Delegate Jim Gilchrist, District 17
Delegate Cheryl D. Glenn, District 45
Delegate Ana Sol Gutierrez, District 18
Delegate Guy Guzzone, District 13
Delegate Anne Healey, District 22
Delegate Sue Hecht, District 3A
Delegate Carolyn J. B. Howard, District 24
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Stephen W. Lafferty, District 42
Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Roger P. Manno, District 19
Delegate Heather R. Mizeur, District 20
Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Dana Stein, District 11

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Construction
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Laws and Ordinances -see also- Pub Local Laws; Uniform Laws.
Local Government Mandates
Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Planning, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse.
Public Schools
Public Works
Real Property
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Zoning and Planning

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Article - 66B Land Use
( 1.01 , 10.01 , 11.01 )
State Finance and Procurement
( 5-7A-01 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 280518/01     Offered on: March 18, 2009   at: 10:18 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 994730/01     Offered on: April 7, 2009   at: 12:14 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 20, 2009: Third Reading Passed (111-21)
April 3, 2009: Third Reading Passed (129-8)
Senate
April 4, 2009: Third Reading Passed (47-0)