Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


2009 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 277

File Code: Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 313
Sponsored By:
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Robey, Forehand, Klausmeier, and Peters
Entitled:
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Statewide Authorization and Use in Highway Work Zones

Synopsis:

Authorizing in all counties and municipalities in the State and in specified highway work zones the use of speed monitoring systems to enforce specified highway speed laws under specified standards and procedures; limiting the operation of a speed monitoring system in a school zone; requiring that revenues from civil fines collected through use of a work zone speed control system under the Act be distributed to a specified special fund to be used only for specified purposes; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/23
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/30
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/27
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Greenip) Adopted
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order later today (Senator Frosh) Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Robey)
Special Order 3/31 (Senator Mooney) Adopted
3/29
Floor Amendment (Senator Robey) Adopted (26-19)
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) Rejected (21-22)
Floor Amendment (Senator Frosh) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (16-29)
Special Order later today (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (21-24)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Third Reading Failed (23-24)
3/31
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Currie) Adopted
Special Order later today (Senator Currie) Adopted
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Currie) Adopted (28-19)
Motion limit debate (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted (29-17)
Third Reading Passed (27-20)
4/6
Returned Passed
House Action
3/30
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/6
Re-referred Environmental Matters
4/7
Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
4/3
Favorable Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Miller) Rejected (38-95)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Smigiel) Rejected (36-98)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) Rejected (38-88)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Conaway) Rejected (42-85)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Conaway) Rejected
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank) Rejected (37-95)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (33-97)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (33-99)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bates) Rejected (44-92)
Second Reading Passed
4/4
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) Rejected (44-86)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank) Rejected (43-86)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (43-86)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Smigiel) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) Rejected (34-85)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) Rejected
Floor Amendment (Delegate Boteler) Rejected (41-88)
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 500

Sponsored by:

President, The
Administration
Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator James N. Robey, District 13

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Citations
Comptroller
Construction
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
District Courts
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Evidence
Fees -see also- Devt Fees and Taxes; Reimbursement Rates
Fines
Forms
Hearings
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Laws and Ordinances -see also- Pub Local Laws; Uniform Laws.
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Notices
Penalties
Privacy
Procurement
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees & Taxes; specific tax.
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Police, Department of
Traffic Regulations
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Trials
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings
( 4-401 , 7-301 , 7-302 , 10-311 )
Insurance
( 11-215 , 11-318 )
State Government
( 10-616 )
Transportation
( 12-118 , 12-118 , 12-118 , 21-809 , 21-810 , 26-305 , 26-401 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 243625/01     Offered on: March 31, 2009   at: Noon     Status: Adopted
Number: 278075/01     Offered on: March 30, 2009   at: 4:44 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 393723/01     Offered on: March 31, 2009   at: 11:28 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 463027/01     Offered on: March 31, 2009   at: 1:22 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 473225/01     Offered on: March 31, 2009   at: 11:52 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 493522/01     Offered on: March 31, 2009   at: 12:02 p.m.     Status: Rejected
House
Number: 133429/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 11:48 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 193121/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 12:18 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 193425/02     Offered on: April 10, 2009   at: 11:27 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 423520/01     Offered on: April 10, 2009   at: 11:35 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 433626/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 10:57 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 443327/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 11:52 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 453421/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 12:03 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 473126/02     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 12:05 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 493120/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 11:11 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 683321/02     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 11:54 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 803823/01     Offered on: April 10, 2009   at: 11:47 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 953724/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 11:55 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 993028/01     Offered on: April 10, 2009   at: 11:36 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 993727/01     Offered on: April 10, 2009   at: 11:46 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 993929/01     Offered on: April 10, 2009   at: 11:30 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 29, 2009: Floor Amendment (Robey) {393723/1 Adopted (26-19)
March 29, 2009: Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {473225/1 Rejected (21-22)
March 29, 2009: Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {493522/1 Rejected (16-29)
March 29, 2009: Floor Amendment (Klausmeier) {463027/1 Rejected (21-24)
March 30, 2009: Third Reading Failed (23-24)
March 31, 2009: Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Currie) Adopted (28-19)
March 31, 2009: Motion limit debate (Kasemeyer) Adopted (29-17)
March 31, 2009: Third Reading Passed (27-20)
House
April 3, 2009: Floor Amendment (Miller) {433626/1 Rejected (38-95)
April 3, 2009: Floor Amendment (Smigiel) {493120/1 Rejected (36-98)
April 3, 2009: Floor Amendment (McDonough) {133429/1 Rejected (38-88)
April 3, 2009: Floor Amendment (Conaway) {443327/1 Rejected (42-85)
April 3, 2009: Floor Amendment (Shank) {953724/1 Rejected (37-95)
April 3, 2009: Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {453421/1 Rejected (33-97)
April 3, 2009: Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {473126/2 Rejected (33-99)
April 3, 2009: Floor Amendment (Bates) {193121/1 Rejected (44-92)
April 4, 2009: Floor Amendment (McDonough) {193425/2 Rejected (44-86)
April 4, 2009: Floor Amendment (Shank) {993929/1 Rejected (43-86)
April 4, 2009: Floor Amendment (Kipke) {423520/1 Rejected (43-86)
April 4, 2009: Floor Amendment (McConkey) Rejected (34-85)
April 4, 2009: Floor Amendment (Boteler) {803823/1 Rejected (41-88)
April 4, 2009: Third Reading Passed (94-41)