About Legislation

Legislation Introduced during the
2018 Regular Session

Senate
BillsSB0001 - SB1269
Joint ResolutionsSJ0001 - SJ0012

House
BillsHB0001 - HB1832
Joint ResolutionsHJ0001 - HJ0014

Enacted Legislation
ChaptersCH0001 - CH0855
Joint ResolutionsJR0001 - JR0003

Status of All Legislation

Note:
Information may not be available for all numbers in each range.

Sponsorship for bills proposed by the Governor and state agencies is listed with the official title of a legislator rather than the Governor due to requirements in the Maryland Constitution. For these bills sponsorship is shown as:

  • The Speaker (By Request of Administration)
  • The President (By Request of Administration)
  • Committee Chair (By Request of Department)

The Legislative Process


Look Up - 2018 Regular Session

Synopsis - Senate Legislation

DateNumberPDFHtml
April 5, 201846PDF PageHTML Page
March 20, 201845PDF PageHTML Page
March 15, 201844PDF PageHTML Page
March 14, 201843PDF PageHTML Page
March 12, 201842PDF PageHTML Page
March 8, 201841PDF PageHTML Page
March 7, 201840PDF PageHTML Page
March 6, 201839PDF PageHTML Page
March 5, 201838PDF PageHTML Page
March 2, 201837PDF PageHTML Page
March 1, 201836PDF PageHTML Page
February 28, 201835PDF PageHTML Page
February 27, 201834PDF PageHTML Page
February 26, 201833PDF PageHTML Page
February 23, 201832PDF PageHTML Page
February 22, 201831PDF PageHTML Page
February 21, 201830PDF PageHTML Page
February 20, 201829PDF PageHTML Page
February 19, 201828PDF PageHTML Page
February 16, 201827PDF PageHTML Page
February 15, 201826PDF PageHTML Page
February 14, 201825PDF PageHTML Page
February 13, 201824PDF PageHTML Page
February 12, 201823PDF PageHTML Page
February 9, 201822PDF PageHTML Page
February 8, 201821PDF PageHTML Page
February 7, 201820PDF PageHTML Page
February 6, 201819PDF PageHTML Page
February 5, 201818PDF PageHTML Page
February 2, 201817PDF PageHTML Page
February 1, 201816PDF PageHTML Page
January 31, 201815PDF PageHTML Page
January 30, 201814PDF PageHTML Page
January 29, 201813PDF PageHTML Page
January 26, 201812PDF PageHTML Page
January 25, 201811PDF PageHTML Page
January 24, 201810PDF PageHTML Page
January 23, 20189PDF PageHTML Page
January 22, 20188PDF PageHTML Page
January 19, 20187PDF PageHTML Page
January 18, 20186PDF PageHTML Page
January 17, 20185PDF PageHTML Page
January 15, 20184PDF PageHTML Page
January 12, 20183PDF PageHTML Page
January 11, 20182PDF PageHTML Page
January 10, 20181PDF PageHTML Page

July 12, 2018 3:26 P.M.