Finance Committee, Chair

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 18)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
Broad Subject
SB0006
    (HB0187 / CH0479)
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - ExpansionIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0017 / CH0657Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and RegulationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 657Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0026State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - MergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0038 / CH0526Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of CopiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0043 / CH0373
    (HB0193 / CH0374)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0052 / CH0664Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policy Plans - Conformity to Federal LawApproved by the Governor - Chapter 664Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0054 / CH0665Health Insurance – Technical Corrections and Required Conformity With Federal LawApproved by the Governor - Chapter 665Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0057 / CH0666Insurance - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Technical CorrectionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 666Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0059 / CH0042Insurance - Antifraud Plan Requirement - ApplicationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0064 / CH0159
    (HB0200 / CH0160)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0067Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RevisingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0071 / CH0043Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and RevocationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0078 / CH0667Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 667Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0087 / CH0212Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of ImpoundmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 212Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0097 / CH0051Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of RecordsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 51Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0105 / CH0660State Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders – Membership and AppointmentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 660Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0108 / CH0661Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 661Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0111 / CH0663Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax InformationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 663Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:07 P.M.