Howard County Delegation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 16)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0391
    (SB0331)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Harriet Tubman Community Center and Museum Ho. Co. 6-17In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0407
    (SB0329)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - The Arc of Howard County HVAC System Replacement Ho. Co. 3-17In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0419
    (SB0332)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Ellicott City Area Flood Mitigation Ho. Co. 7-17In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0421
    (SB0339)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - PHILLIPS School Commercial Kitchen Ho. Co. 4-17In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0422
    (SB0330)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Carrollton Hall Restoration Ho. Co. 2-17In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0423
    (SB0333)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - ManneqART Museum and Maryland Fashion Institute Ho. Co. 5-17In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0566Howard County - Property Tax - Exemption for Personal Property of Business Located in Historic District Ho. Co. 10-17In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0572Howard County - Property Tax Credit for Commercial Real Property - Flood Damage Ho. Co. 9-17In the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0677Howard County - Noise Control - Outdoor Concert Venues Ho. Co. 18-17In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0678
    (SB0755)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Chrysalis Pavilion in Merriweather Park at Symphony Woods Ho. Co. 1-17In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0797Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Thresholds for Tasting Ho. Co. 19-17In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0850Howard County - Board of Education Fund Transfers - Approval Process Ho. Co. 16-17In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1299Howard County Board of Education - Elected School Board Ho. Co. 11-17In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1343Howard County - Fire and Explosive Investigator - Authority Ho. Co. 24-17In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1604Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Law Enforcement Officers and Fire and Rescue Services Members Ho. Co. 17-17In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1630
    (SB1170)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Tau Pi Mentoring Program Ho. Co. 25-17In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

March 27, 2017 8:25 P.M.