HB1234 (CH0403)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20182/8/2018First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {175165/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/17/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)47A
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance48B
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments {234333/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/9/20184/3/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (138-0)68
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.