HB1215 (CH0408)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - Study

Sponsored by:

Delegate Walker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (105-33)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Finance50
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {287373/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)60
House4/6/20134/1/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (98-30)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.