HB0298 (CH0413)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Student Data Privacy Act of 2015

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20152/4/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/5/20152/5/2015Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20153/18/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/19/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments {765560/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/20/20153/19/2015Third Reading Passed (122-13)49
Senate3/23/20153/20/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
3/24/20153/24/2015Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20154/10/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20154/3/2015Favorable with Amendments {594936/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/11/20154/4/2015Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {343523/1 Adopted62
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)62
House4/13/20154/7/2015House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (128-11)68
Passed Enrolled68
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:41 P.M.