HB0569

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment - Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Financial Assistance Study

Sponsored by:

Delegate Elliott

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/31/20131/31/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
2/1/20132/1/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs41
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.