HB0877 (CH0555)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt Regulations

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable with Amendments {626780/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20133/8/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)43
Senate3/11/20133/11/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.