HB1058

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts

Sponsored by:

Delegate Miller, W.

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20172/8/2017First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {593790/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/18/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (123-17)49
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:04 P.M.