HB1119 (CH0317)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Zucker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Appropriations
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {244062/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Finance52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable Report by Finance
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.