HB1164 (CH0246)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland College and Career-Ready Standards and Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Implementation Review Workgroup

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20142/7/2014First Reading Ways and Means
2/10/20142/10/2014Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20143/14/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20143/11/2014Favorable with Amendments {365069/3 Report Adopted47
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 47
3/15/20143/12/2014Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {643024/3 Rejected (42-85)48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/17/20143/13/2014Third Reading Passed (127-8)49
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20143/23/2014Favorable with Amendments {774133/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/2/20143/24/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)58
House4/4/20143/28/2014House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments64
House Requests Senate Recede64
Conference Committee Appointed64
Delegates A. Washington, Serafini, and Kaiser64
Senate4/5/20143/27/2014Senate Refuses to Recede61
Conference Committee Appointed61
Senators Pinsky, Benson, and Jennings61
House4/7/20144/1/2014Conference Committee Report Adopted68
Third Reading Passed (137-0)68
Senate4/7/20143/30/2014Conference Committee Report Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (46-1)64
House4/7/20144/1/2014Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.