HB1458 (CH0252)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Correctional Services - Charges Recommending Discipline - Investigative Period

Sponsored by:

Chair, Appropriations Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/19/20142/19/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/20142/27/2014Rereferred to Appropriations
2/27/20142/27/2014Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/10/20143/10/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/11/20143/8/2014Favorable with Amendments {944567/1 Report Adopted44
Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Cluster) Adopted 44
3/12/20143/9/2014Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Cluster) Adopted 45
3/14/20143/11/2014Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/15/20143/12/2014Third Reading Passed (131-0)48A
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Senate Rules47
3/28/20143/31/2014Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20144/2/2014Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20144/7/2014Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/7/20143/28/2014Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/7/20143/29/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)63
House4/7/20144/2/2014Returned Passed69
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 14, 2014 1:54 P.M.