SB0461 (CH0470)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - Accessibility

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20131/30/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {864735/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Ways and Means51
3/21/20133/21/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (140-0)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.