SJ0001 (JR0003)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution

Sponsored by:

Senator Frosh

Status:

Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/13/20141/13/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/20141/15/2014Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings6
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2/17/20142/17/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Favorable with Amendments {508575/1 Report Adopted27
Second Reading Passed with Amendments27
2/19/20142/19/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)29
House2/20/20142/20/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations32
3/26/20143/26/2014Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
4/4/20144/4/2014Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/5/20143/29/2014Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/7/20143/31/2014Third Reading Passed (136-0)67
Senate4/7/20143/29/2014Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2014 2:27 P.M.