Anne Arundel County Delegation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0027 / CH0394Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center PropertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Environment and Transportation
2/5/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0173
    (SB0135 / CH0324)
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Anne Arundel County Detention OfficersVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB0175
    (SB0167)
Anne Arundel County - Police Officers - Secondary EmploymentIn the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0331Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0447 / CH0420
    (SB0089)
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Election DaysApproved by the Governor - Chapter 420Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0555 / CH0432Anne Arundel County - Semipermanent Food Service Facilities - Wastewater DisposalApproved by the Governor - Chapter 432Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
HB0848 / CH0459
    (SB0484)
Anne Arundel County Public Schools Funding Accountability and Transparency ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 459Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1152Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit ProgramIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesBy Request - CommitteeTransportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.