Anne Arundel County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 12)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0028Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center PropertyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesBy Request - CommitteeState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0037 / CH0328
    (SB0008 / CH0327)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Deferrals - Payment Due DateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 328Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0102Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit ProgramIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0172 / CH0035
    (SB0144)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education and School Board Nominating CommissionGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 35Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0238 / CH0660
    (SB0175 / CH0659)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Disposition of FeesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 660Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0272
    (SB0047 / CH0042)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability CompaniesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0321 / CH0334
    (SB0046 / CH0333)
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0366 / CH0102
    (SB0048)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind IndividualsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0602 / CH0354
    (SB0141 / CH0353)
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater ServicesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 354Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeSpecial Taxing Districts (L4)
HB0642 / CH0110
    (SB0033)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 110Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0764
    (SB0521)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesBy Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB1273Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot ProgramIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.