Anne Arundel County Delegation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0085 / CH0474Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0102Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot ProgramIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Ways and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0695 / CH0096
    (SB0930 / CH0095)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0716 / CH0473
    (SB0899)
Anne Arundel County - Board of EducationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1269 / CH0060
    (SB0251 / CH0059)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited IncomeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:45 P.M.