Anne Arundel County Senators

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0141
    (HB0299)
Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of OperationIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0714
    (HB1218)
Possession of Medical Cannabis in Local Correctional Facilities – ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
SB0265
    (HB0429)
Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and ReleaseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherPublic Safety (E4)
SB1176 / CH0675
    (HB1746)
Housing Commission of Anne Arundel County - TermsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 675Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:08 P.M.