Appropriations Committee, Chair

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0103Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General AssemblyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations By Request - DepartmentalCapital Budget (B5)
HB0104 / CH0214Department of Budget and Management - Budget Analysts - QualificationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 214Appropriations
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0207 / CH0589State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building CouncilApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Health and Government Operations
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0765 / CH0613State Personnel - Authority to Set CompensationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0821
    (SB0998 / CH0575)
Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationAppropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation By Request - DepartmentalCapital Budget (B5)
HB0822 / CH0239State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - City of Hyattsville and Satellite OrganizationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1457 / CH0257State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Definition of Correctional OfficerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
HB1458 / CH0252Correctional Services - Charges Recommending Discipline - Investigative PeriodApproved by the Governor - Chapter 252Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.