Appropriations Committee, Chair

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 2 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0066 / CH0088Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalChildren (O4)
HB0164 / CH0098State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current EmployeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Personnel (P4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.