Budget and Taxation Committee, Chair

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0067 / CH0017Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control PurposesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 17Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0068Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality AssuranceIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0069 / CH0174Tobacco Products - Tobacco Tax - Exemptions and PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0070 / CH0175Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0076Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous FeesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationBy Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0183 / CH0028Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax CreditApproved by the Governor - Chapter 28Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:45 A.M.