Baltimore City Administration

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 17)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0311
    (SB0265)
Gang-Related Crimes - ReportingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0312
    (SB0264)
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0313 / CH0594
    (SB0266)
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - WarrantsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Ways and Means
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0314 / CH0479
    (SB0267 / CH0478)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed DwellingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0315 / CH0096
    (SB0396)
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or GuardianshipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Judiciary
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeFamily Law (D4)
HB0354 / CH0396
    (SB0263)
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
HB0386
    (SB0390 / CH0493)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0876 / CH0194
    (SB0736 / CH0193)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - CalculationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1351 / CH0453Baltimore City - Special Police Officers and School Police OfficersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0263
    (HB0354 / CH0396)
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange ProgramIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
SB0264
    (HB0312)
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - ProhibitionIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0265
    (HB0311)
Gang-Related Crimes - ReportingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0266
    (HB0313 / CH0594)
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - WarrantsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0267 / CH0478
    (HB0314 / CH0479)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed DwellingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0390 / CH0493
    (HB0386)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0396
    (HB0315 / CH0096)
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or GuardianshipVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeFamily Law (D4)
SB0736 / CH0193
    (HB0876 / CH0194)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - CalculationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Budget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.