Baltimore City Administration

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 17)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0311
    (SB0400 / CH0851)
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve FundIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesBy Request - CommitteeEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0788 / CH0227
    (SB0676 / CH0226)
Baltimore City - Community Benefits DistrictsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0796
    (SB0841)
Pimlico Community Development Authority – MembershipIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0991
    (SB1062)
Weapon Crimes – Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms – PossessionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB1385 / CH0641
    (SB1085 / CH0642)
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement DistrictApproved by the Governor - Chapter 641Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1508Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1548 / CH0639
    (SB1084 / CH0640)
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership FundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1553 / CH0637
    (SB0826 / CH0638)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful EvictionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 637Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1740
    (SB1179)
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing BoardIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
SB0400 / CH0851
    (HB0311)
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve FundEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0676 / CH0226
    (HB0788 / CH0227)
Baltimore City - Community Benefits DistrictsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 226Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0826 / CH0638
    (HB1553 / CH0637)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful EvictionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 638Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0841
    (HB0796)
Pimlico Community Development Authority – MembershipIn the Senate - Hearing canceledFinanceBy Request - CommitteeBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1062
    (HB0991)
Weapon Crimes - Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms - PossessionIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
SB1084 / CH0640
    (HB1548 / CH0639)
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership FundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 640Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB1085 / CH0642
    (HB1385 / CH0641)
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement DistrictApproved by the Governor - Chapter 642Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1179
    (HB1740)
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing BoardIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.