Baltimore County Delegation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 11)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0074 / CH0367Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367Ways and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0076 / CH0368Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Ways and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0087 / CH0800Baltimore County Board of Education – Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member ScholarshipsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800Ways and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0320Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association StandingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeReal Property (N1)
HB0334 / CH0079
    (SB0306 / CH0080)
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - License TransfersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1393 / CH0761Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Interest in Multiple LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 761Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1395 / CH0762Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages – Authorization for Issuing an Additional Class B License – RepealedApproved by the Governor - Chapter 762Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1396 / CH0763Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 763Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1410 / CH0764Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - ExpirationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 764Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1575 / CH0765Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 765Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1600 / CH0496Baltimore County Anti–Bullying Task ForceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 12:56 P.M.