Baltimore County Delegation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0088 / CH0850Education - Selection of Members to the Baltimore County School BoardEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850Ways and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0183Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)Ways and Means
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0220Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human HabitationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeReal Property (N1)
HB0750Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Fallen or Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of DwellingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1579 / CH0510
    (SB1099 / CH0511)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life CenterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePrior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.