Calvert County Delegation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1423 / CH0310Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed LegislationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1439
    (SB0473 / CH0080)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1440 / CH0146Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal ContractsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1478Calvert County - Competitive Bidding ProcessIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 30, 2017 1:02 P.M.