Calvert County Senators

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0457Calvert County - Local Forest Conservation Fund - Administrative CostsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0458 / CH0056
    (HB0802)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 56Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0511Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - FinesIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0729 / CH0310Calvert County - County Commissioners - Method of ElectionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0737Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event LicensesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1004 / CH0337Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 337Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.