Calvert County Senators

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0229Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil PenaltiesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0230 / CH0154
    (HB0167)
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Recipient BenefitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0231Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer and Wine Festival LicenseIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0265 / CH0334Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
SB0359Calvert County - Contracts and Purchasing - Bidding ProcessIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0360 / CH0162Calvert County - Budget Hearings and ProceduresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0361Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle ClubsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0362 / CH0027
    (HB0902)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 27Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.